U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00315-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rose
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 03, 2015: [Sealed Document]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 19, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • August 18, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • July 16, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.