U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00120-17
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasquez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [2255 Motion Filed]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 20, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reduction of Sentence (non-drug)]
  • August 07, 2020: [Reply to Response]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • July 21, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 14, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 07, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 02, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 29, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2020: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 12, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 04, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 30, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 22, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 14, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 12, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • December 10, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 22, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • October 22, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 16, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 25, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 25, 2019: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • August 21, 2019: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • June 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 14, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 14, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 02, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 24, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • October 23, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 15, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • October 02, 2018: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • March 08, 2018: [Transcript]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • December 07, 2017: [Passport Returned]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • December 05, 2017: [Return of Passport]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Transcript]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 17, 2017: [Transcript]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 13, 2017: [Transcript]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Transcript]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 05, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 30, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 30, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 29, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 29, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • June 28, 2017: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • June 22, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 21, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • June 21, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 21, 2017: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • June 20, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 18, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 15, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Continue ]
  • May 08, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 04, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 02, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 11, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • April 06, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 05, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • April 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 28, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 22, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 15, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 09, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 08, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 08, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • March 02, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 01, 2017: [Payment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 28, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 28, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • February 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 21, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 20, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 16, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 13, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 06, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 30, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 27, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 26, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 23, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 23, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 23, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 20, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 19, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 18, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 18, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • January 11, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 11, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 11, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 10, 2017: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • January 06, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 04, 2017: [Transcript]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 29, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 29, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 29, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 28, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 28, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 28, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • December 28, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 28, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 28, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • December 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 21, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • December 20, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 20, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 12, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 07, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • December 05, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 17, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 17, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 17, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 16, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 15, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 03, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 01, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 01, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 26, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 24, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 04, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 03, 2016: [Continue ]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 21, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 21, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 20, 2016: [Frye Hearing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • September 19, 2016: [Jury Instructions/Charge]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • September 19, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • September 19, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • September 19, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 18, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 18, 2016: [Order]
  • September 16, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • September 14, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 14, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • September 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Bond]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 14, 2016: [Frye Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • September 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2016: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • September 13, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • September 13, 2016: [Witness List]
  • September 13, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 13, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 13, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 13, 2016: [Frye Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 12, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order Returning Submission]
  • September 09, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • September 09, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 07, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 07, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Returning Submission]
  • August 24, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 24, 2016: [Seal]
  • August 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 22, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 18, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Brady Materials]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • August 11, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • August 11, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 10, 2016: [Suppress]
  • August 10, 2016: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • August 09, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 04, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2016: [Search Warrant Issued ]
  • August 04, 2016: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • August 03, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • August 02, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Suppress]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 23, 2016: [Suppress]
  • July 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 15, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • July 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 13, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 13, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 13, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 11, 2016: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 08, 2016: [Indictment]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order]
  • July 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 24, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 24, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 24, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order Returning Submission]
  • June 11, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 31, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 24, 2016: [Bond]
  • May 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 18, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 16, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 13, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 29, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 27, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • April 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Conference]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Conference]
  • March 31, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 23, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 22, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 09, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 09, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 26, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 25, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 25, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 24, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • February 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 19, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 19, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • February 18, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • February 18, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • February 18, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 17, 2016: [Appear]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 17, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • February 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 16, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 15, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 15, 2016: [Seal]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • February 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 12, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 12, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 12, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 12, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 11, 2016: [ExParte Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 08, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
  • February 03, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 22, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 15, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 14, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 24, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 21, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 21, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
  • December 21, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 21, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 17, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 17, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 17, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • July 17, 2015: [Waiver of Ten-Day Notice]
  • July 17, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • July 17, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Waiver of Ten-Day Notice]
  • July 17, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 17, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 17, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.