U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herndon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 11, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • February 07, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Transcript]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 01, 2019: [Status Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • March 13, 2017: [Travel ]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.