U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 06, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Transcript]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2016: [In Chambers Conference]
  • May 05, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 28, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 22, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 17, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 17, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2015: [Sentencing]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 08, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Bond]
  • July 17, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 17, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 17, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • July 17, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [Information - Felony]
  • July 17, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 17, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 17, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.