U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weisman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • June 08, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • February 04, 2019: [Travel ]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Passport Returned]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • January 13, 2017: [Return of Passport]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Sealed Transcript]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 15, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 09, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • October 09, 2015: [Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 21, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 14, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 10, 2015: [Extension of Time]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.