U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Battaglia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order]
  • October 30, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 29, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 27, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 26, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 26, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 15, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 14, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 13, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 09, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Bond]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 20, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 20, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • July 20, 2015: [Appear]
  • July 20, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • July 20, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 20, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 20, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.