U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:99-cr-00244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Suggs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 12, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Reconsideration]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Status Report]
  • April 08, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 07, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • March 05, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • February 26, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • December 22, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 07, 2020: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 23, 2019: [USCA Request]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 29, 2016: [Protective Order]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.