U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morgan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 05, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • July 17, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 17, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 21, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • October 19, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Transcript]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 01, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 01, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 01, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 01, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 01, 2016: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 19, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • February 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 16, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • February 04, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 09, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 04, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 04, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 04, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 04, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • November 04, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Order]
  • August 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.