U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saucier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Transcript]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • September 12, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • September 12, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • September 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2016: [Transcript]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 08, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2016: [Extension of Time]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 27, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 27, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 27, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 18, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • May 17, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 12, 2016: [Seal]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 12, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 11, 2016: [Jury Selection]
  • May 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 04, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 02, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 02, 2016: [Sealed Document]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 25, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
  • April 21, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2016: [In Limine ]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice]
  • March 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • February 19, 2016: [Brady Materials]
  • February 19, 2016: [Suppress]
  • February 19, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • February 19, 2016: [Discovery]
  • February 12, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 25, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 24, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order]
  • September 03, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • August 12, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2015: [Conference]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 27, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 27, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 24, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 24, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.