U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • March 19, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 10, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 10, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 10, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Transcript]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 12, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 12, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 11, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 10, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 10, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • October 11, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • October 04, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Seal]
  • October 03, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 02, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 02, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Seal]
  • October 01, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 01, 2018: [Sealed Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 11, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 10, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 05, 2018: [Seal]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 23, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • August 15, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 08, 2018: [Sealed Document]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2018: [Continue ]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 20, 2018: [Continue ]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Continue ]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Continue ]
  • January 26, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 26, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 22, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Continue ]
  • October 20, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 19, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 03, 2017: [Continue ]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 18, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 18, 2017: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • August 18, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • August 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 04, 2017: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2017: [Trial Memo]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • August 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2017: [Frye Hearing]
  • August 02, 2017: [In Limine ]
  • August 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 01, 2017: [In Limine ]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [In Limine ]
  • July 26, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 26, 2017: [Trial Memo]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • July 24, 2017: [Hearing ]
  • July 20, 2017: [Continue ]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Continue ]
  • May 15, 2017: [Continue ]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • April 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 07, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2017: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 13, 2017: [Continue ]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 25, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 24, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 18, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • January 10, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 21, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • November 21, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • November 21, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2016: [Indictment]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 14, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 14, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • October 11, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 22, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 25, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 25, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 21, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 15, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 15, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 01, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 01, 2016: [Seal]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 16, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 14, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 17, 2016: [ExParte Document]
  • May 17, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 13, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 12, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order]
  • April 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 26, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 26, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 26, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • April 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 26, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 26, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 21, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 15, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 11, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 10, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 10, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 10, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 14, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Interim Payment]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 24, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 18, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 05, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • August 05, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 05, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 05, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 05, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 28, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • July 28, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 28, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • July 28, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 28, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 28, 2015: [Order]
  • July 28, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • July 27, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • July 27, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • July 24, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 24, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.