U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Singh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 15, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 16, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 16, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.