U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00359-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Owens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Transcript]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 29, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • March 27, 2019: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 20, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 08, 2019: [Continue ]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Continue ]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 07, 2018: [Continue ]
  • December 03, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 10, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.