U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00054-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Hines et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 31, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 29, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2020
  • June 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - RE: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • March 13, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • March 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 06, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 28, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 25, 2019: [Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • February 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel re Crack Cocaine]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 28, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2019: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence Crack Cocaine Offense 18:3582]
  • January 28, 2019: [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 09, 2018: [Violation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 08, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 25, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 25, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 20, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 29, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.