U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Krantz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • March 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 17, 2016: [Seal]
  • March 10, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 17, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 11, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
  • December 06, 2015: [Exhibit]
  • December 06, 2015: [Seal]
  • December 06, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 04, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 03, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 03, 2015: [Seal]
  • December 03, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 03, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 01, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 01, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 30, 2015: [Seal]
  • November 20, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 20, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Notice]
  • September 21, 2015: [Order]
  • September 10, 2015: [Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Transcript]
  • August 10, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 29, 2015: [Seal]
  • July 29, 2015: [Bond]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 29, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • July 29, 2015: [Information - Felony]
  • July 29, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • July 29, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • July 29, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 29, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 29, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 29, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • July 29, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • July 29, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 29, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • July 29, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 29, 2015: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • July 29, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.