U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:99-cr-00235-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frankel et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Witness List]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Appearance Pro Se]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 25, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 22, 2021: [Witness List]
  • October 21, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • October 20, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Conference]
  • September 13, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 07, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Hearing ]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 22, 2019: [Seal]
  • July 22, 2019: [Application for Writ]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Writ Returned]
  • May 11, 2017: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 05, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • April 04, 2017: [Seal]
  • April 04, 2017: [Application for Writ]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 16, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Prob 12A(1) Modification of Monetary Condition]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order Returning Submission]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Transcript]
  • January 08, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 07, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 04, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 01, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 20, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 20, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 20, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • November 20, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 20, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • November 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Order]
  • October 09, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 08, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 02, 2015: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.