U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2025: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 31, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 26, 2025: [Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • January 04, 2023: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 04, 2023: [Violation Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • January 03, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • December 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 15, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Seal]
  • April 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • March 16, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 08, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 08, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 06, 2021: [Reconsideration]
January, 2021
  • January 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • January 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2020: [Seal]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Compel ]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Transcript]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [2255 Motion Filed]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 04, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 04, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 04, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 09, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • November 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 19, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 06, 2017: [Transcript]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 13, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • September 13, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 23, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • August 17, 2017: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 15, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 15, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • August 15, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 07, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 31, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 28, 2017: [Transcript]
  • July 24, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 21, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 21, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • July 21, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 14, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 12, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 05, 2017: [Continue ]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 30, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2017: [Continue ]
  • May 25, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 25, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 17, 2017: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 11, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 27, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 27, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • April 26, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 25, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 25, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • April 15, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 06, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 30, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 30, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 30, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • March 29, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 29, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 29, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 29, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 28, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 28, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 27, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 23, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 23, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 17, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 17, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 17, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 15, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 15, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • March 15, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 14, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 14, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 08, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 08, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 08, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 08, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 07, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • March 07, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 06, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 28, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 28, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 23, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • February 23, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 23, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 16, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 16, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • February 16, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 16, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 16, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 15, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 14, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • February 14, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 12, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 10, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 09, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 07, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 31, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 30, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 30, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 30, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 27, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 26, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 26, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 25, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 24, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 23, 2017: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 18, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 16, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 13, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 12, 2017: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • January 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 04, 2017: [Bond]
  • January 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 27, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 06, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 17, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 17, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 16, 2016: [Bond]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 10, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • November 10, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • November 10, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • November 10, 2016: [Produce ]
  • November 10, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 09, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 08, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • November 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 07, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • November 03, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 02, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 30, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 27, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 19, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 18, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • October 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 13, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 11, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • October 06, 2016: [Bond]
  • October 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 03, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • October 03, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 29, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 23, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • September 23, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • September 22, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • September 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Disclosure ]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 26, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • July 26, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 26, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 26, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • July 25, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Status Conference]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 18, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 17, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 16, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • June 14, 2016: [Produce ]
  • June 14, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • June 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 14, 2016: [Suppress]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • April 29, 2016: [Bond]
  • April 28, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2016: [Discovery]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 01, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • January 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order]
  • January 12, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • January 12, 2016: [Exoneration of Bond]
  • January 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 12, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 12, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • January 12, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • January 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 07, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • January 06, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Produce ]
  • December 29, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 22, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 18, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • December 16, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • December 16, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2015: [Bond]
  • December 16, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 16, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 16, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 16, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • December 15, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 10, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 10, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 10, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 10, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 10, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 10, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 10, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 10, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • December 10, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • December 09, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 09, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • December 09, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 09, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 09, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 09, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 09, 2015: [Arrest ]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 19, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • September 04, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 29, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.