U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 06, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 06, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continue ]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 12, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 27, 2017: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 20, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 16, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 15, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 22, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 04, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 03, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 06, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 05, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 05, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 05, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • November 05, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 05, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • November 02, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.