U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 25, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 23, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • August 18, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 02, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 02, 2015: [Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 28, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 16, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 06, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 24, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 03, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 04, 2015: [Information - Felony]
  • August 04, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order]
  • August 04, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 04, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 04, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 04, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 04, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 04, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • August 04, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 04, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.