U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Liff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 03, 2021: [Dismiss ]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 17, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 17, 2021: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order of Transfer]
  • August 13, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 08, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2020: [Bond]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • April 22, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • April 22, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2020: [Bond]
  • April 10, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2020: [Violation Report]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 19, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2017: [Continue ]
  • June 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 16, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 02, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 27, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2017: [Continue ]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 15, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • October 18, 2016: [Bond]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 18, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 04, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 26, 2016: [Seal]
  • September 26, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 09, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Information - Felony]
  • August 05, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 05, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 05, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2015: [Bond]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 05, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.