U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00215-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 17, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 13, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 12, 2020: [Violation Report]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 11, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Dismiss ]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 29, 2020: [Violation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • January 17, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • January 17, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Appeal Record Returned]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 18, 2016: [Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Vacate ]
  • January 15, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 04, 2015: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [USCA Request]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 07, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 07, 2015: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.