U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Esquivel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 10, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 10, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Dismiss ]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 27, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 26, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 26, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 22, 2016: [Letter]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Information - Felony]
  • August 11, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 11, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 11, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 11, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • August 11, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.