U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00251-10
  • Case Name: USA v. Vincente-Sanchez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 10, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Instrument Returned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.