U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cohran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 06, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 16, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Restitution Order]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 04, 2016: [Extension of Time]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 22, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • January 13, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 06, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 16, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 16, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 12, 2015: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • August 12, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 12, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 12, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 12, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2015: [Bond]
  • August 12, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • August 12, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • August 12, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.