U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Simons et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 14, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • July 14, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 16, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Witness List]
  • September 06, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • September 06, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 23, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 22, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 19, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 19, 2016: [Witness List]
  • August 19, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order]
  • August 10, 2016: [Violation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 19, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 19, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • May 18, 2016: [Arrest ]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.