U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. General et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • June 05, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 05, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order Returning Submission]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • February 01, 2019: [Seal]
  • February 01, 2019: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.