U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • August 14, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 13, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.