U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goldreich
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Seal]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 10, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 27, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 27, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 27, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 26, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 26, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 19, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • October 15, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 15, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Order]
  • August 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 20, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.