U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Husman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Transcript]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 12, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 17, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • November 17, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 17, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 17, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 17, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 05, 2015: [Extension of Time]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 01, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 01, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 24, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • August 24, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 24, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.