U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • May 05, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • June 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 26, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 26, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 15, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 14, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [Seal]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 25, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 09, 2017: [Continue ]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 25, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • November 24, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge]
  • November 20, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 19, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order]
  • November 18, 2015: [Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 04, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • November 02, 2015: [Extension of Time]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 28, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 28, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 23, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 01, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 25, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • August 25, 2015: [Bond]
  • August 25, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.