U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00360-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 13, 2022: [Seal]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • August 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • June 14, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • September 22, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • September 22, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 12, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • April 24, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - RE: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • April 20, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 13, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • April 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 06, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 13, 2019: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 01, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
  • February 27, 2019: [Compel ]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Transcript]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order of Transfer-USCA]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2016: [Letter]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 28, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 14, 2016: [Letter]
  • January 13, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [USCA Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.