U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hurt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 22, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 21, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 14, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 14, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 14, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 14, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • December 04, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 14, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • November 07, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 07, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • June 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2017: [Summons Issued]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 24, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 20, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 25, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 09, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • February 04, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Status Conference]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.