U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00149-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bergenn et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 03, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 18, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 10, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 05, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 28, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 27, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • August 27, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 23, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 23, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 22, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 14, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 10, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Continue ]
  • March 15, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 15, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 01, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 28, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • February 28, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 28, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 21, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 20, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 19, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 21, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • November 20, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 19, 2018: [Transcript]
  • November 19, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2018: [Status Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Sealed Transcript]
  • October 31, 2018: [Transcript]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 26, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 26, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Continue ]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order Referring Plea]
  • April 04, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 03, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 23, 2018: [Continue ]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
  • December 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • September 11, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 08, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Continue ]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Continue ]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 30, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 26, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 21, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Waiver of Sentencing Time]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • September 26, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 17, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2016: [Continue ]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 15, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • August 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • August 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 18, 2016: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 23, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 16, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 10, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2016: [Hearing ]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Status Conference]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 21, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 21, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 20, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 16, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2015: [Approve Associate Counsel]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.