U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shapiro et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2022: [Pretrial Diversion Waiver]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 21, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • April 19, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 08, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 02, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 06, 2021: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • January 05, 2021: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • January 05, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • January 04, 2021: [Redact Transcript]
  • January 04, 2021: [Transcript]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 04, 2021: [Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 18, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 15, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 14, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • December 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
  • December 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 03, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 03, 2020: [Seal]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 30, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 24, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 05, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Continue ]
  • October 13, 2020: [Transcript]
  • October 08, 2020: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 28, 2020: [Transcript]
  • September 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Transcript]
  • May 11, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 05, 2020: [Transcript]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 29, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 08, 2020: [Continue ]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 04, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [USCA Order]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 05, 2019: [Leave to File]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • August 09, 2018: [Reply to Response]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 10, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • July 06, 2018: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • July 06, 2018: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 27, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 12, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 08, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2018: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2018: [Sever Defendant]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 10, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 10, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 16, 2018: [Continue ]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Transcript]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • October 24, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 20, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 02, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 02, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 23, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 21, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 17, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 01, 2017: [Certificate of Good Standing]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 18, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • July 06, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Acquittal]
  • June 27, 2017: [Acquittal]
  • June 22, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • June 20, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 15, 2017: [Court Exhibits]
  • June 15, 2017: [Witness List]
  • June 15, 2017: [Jury Verdict]
  • June 15, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • June 14, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • June 13, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • June 12, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • June 08, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • June 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 07, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 06, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • June 01, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • June 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 31, 2017: [Strike ]
  • May 30, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 30, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 30, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • May 30, 2017: [Strike ]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 30, 2017: [Acquittal]
  • May 29, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • May 29, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • May 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 23, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 22, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 19, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 17, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 16, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 15, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 11, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 10, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 09, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 08, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • May 04, 2017: [Jury Selection]
  • May 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 03, 2017: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • May 03, 2017: [Jury Selection]
  • May 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 27, 2017: [Sever Defendant]
  • April 26, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 24, 2017: [Transcript]
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2017: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 14, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 12, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 12, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 11, 2017: [Trial Memo]
  • April 11, 2017: [Seal]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • April 11, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 05, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 05, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 05, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2017: [Transcript]
  • April 04, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 30, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 29, 2017: [Trial Memo]
  • March 29, 2017: [In Limine ]
  • March 28, 2017: [Preclude]
  • March 28, 2017: [Compel ]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 15, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 15, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • March 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 09, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • March 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 07, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • March 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 01, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 04, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 03, 2017: [Seal]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • December 08, 2016: [Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
  • December 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2016: [Transcript]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2016: [Transcript]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • October 19, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 17, 2016: [Adopt]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 06, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 26, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 24, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 24, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 11, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 10, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 05, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 05, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 05, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [Indictment]
  • August 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • July 27, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • July 27, 2016: [Leave to File]
  • July 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 25, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 25, 2016: [Seal]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 11, 2016: [Transcript]
  • July 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 08, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • July 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2016: [Status Conference]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • May 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • May 18, 2016: [Preclude]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • May 02, 2016: [Leave to File]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • March 18, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • March 18, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 17, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 08, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 19, 2016: [Transcript]
  • February 04, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 04, 2016: [Discovery]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • January 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 29, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 29, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 29, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • January 27, 2016: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • January 27, 2016: [Bond]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 26, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 20, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 10, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Transcript]
  • November 02, 2015: [Transcript]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 06, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2015: [Certificate of Good Standing]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 25, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 25, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • September 25, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 15, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 09, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • September 09, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.