U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 08, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 23, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 18, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Suppress]
  • November 09, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 26, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 26, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 16, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 16, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 29, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 29, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 29, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 29, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 29, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 23, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 15, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.