U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. George
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • June 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 07, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Order]
  • October 05, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 05, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 20, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • September 15, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.