U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gamble
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Transcript]
  • August 01, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 31, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 31, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • July 25, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 25, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 18, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 17, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 17, 2018: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 17, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: [Arrest ]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Continue ]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 06, 2016: [Continue ]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 04, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 03, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 03, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 27, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 05, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • November 05, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2015: [Bond]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • November 01, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 21, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • September 18, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • September 18, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 18, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 18, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.