U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acoff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 28, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 24, 2020: [Continue ]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 04, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 04, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • August 05, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 04, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 04, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 02, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 02, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 02, 2016: [Dismiss ]
July, 2016
  • July 31, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 28, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • November 06, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Status Conference]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 22, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 21, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • September 18, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 18, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.