U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00125-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [2255 Motion Filed]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2016: [Status Conference]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 23, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 23, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 04, 2016: [Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 22, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • December 22, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 22, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 22, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • December 14, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 10, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 07, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • December 04, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 04, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 20, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • November 20, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 20, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 20, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • November 09, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 23, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 23, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 23, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.