U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Held
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Compliance Review Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 16, 2022: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Compliance Review Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.