U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Julious
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 16, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2021: [Seal]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 19, 2021: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 19, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • March 01, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Transcript]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 12, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 28, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 16, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Seal]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 29, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 09, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 07, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 04, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • December 04, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 04, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 04, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 05, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 02, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 22, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.