U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Navin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 01, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2015: [Dismiss ]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order]
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • October 30, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 30, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 30, 2015: [Bond]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 14, 2015: [Extension of Time]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.