U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00168-9
  • Case Name: USA v. Cintron et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • October 14, 2022: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2022: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Seal]
  • April 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 24, 2022: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 17, 2021: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 17, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • June 16, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 16, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • June 02, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 24, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 14, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 07, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 06, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • January 05, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 05, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • January 04, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 29, 2020: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • December 29, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 24, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • December 24, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 18, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 18, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 18, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 18, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Dismiss ]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 19, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Transcript]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 08, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 08, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • January 16, 2018: [Passport Returned]
  • January 12, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Transcript]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 06, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 02, 2017: [Extension of Time]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • September 08, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 01, 2017: [Vacate ]
  • September 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 08, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • August 08, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 07, 2017: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 14, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 14, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • July 14, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 14, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 13, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • July 13, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 12, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 12, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • July 12, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 11, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 11, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • July 11, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 10, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 09, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 09, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 08, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • July 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 05, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 05, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 05, 2017: [Seal]
  • July 05, 2017: [Extension of Time]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 19, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • June 17, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 14, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 12, 2017: [Continue ]
  • June 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 31, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 26, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 26, 2017: [Continue ]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sealed Order]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2017: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 21, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 21, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 21, 2017: [Continue ]
  • April 19, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 19, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 10, 2017: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 04, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • April 03, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 29, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 28, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 24, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • March 24, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 23, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 15, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 15, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 15, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 13, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 10, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 09, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 08, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Continue ]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 22, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 22, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 21, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 15, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Continue ]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 27, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 13, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • January 10, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 03, 2017: [Extension of Time]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 27, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • December 23, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 23, 2016: [Transcript]
  • December 22, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 22, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 19, 2016: [Seal]
  • December 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 16, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 16, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 14, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
  • December 11, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 05, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 01, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • December 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 01, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 30, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 30, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • November 30, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 28, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 28, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 10, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 10, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 10, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 09, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • November 09, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 07, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 07, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 31, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 31, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 30, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 30, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 30, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 25, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 21, 2016: [Payment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 19, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • October 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 17, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 13, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 13, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 13, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • October 10, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • October 07, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 03, 2016: [Continue ]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 22, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 19, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 16, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 14, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 09, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 07, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 06, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 24, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 23, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 22, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2016: [Bond]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • August 11, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 05, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2016: [Bond]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 22, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 22, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 13, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 08, 2016: [Arrest ]
  • July 08, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 05, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 29, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order]
  • June 28, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 22, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 20, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 16, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • June 14, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • June 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 02, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 18, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • May 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 10, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 10, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 09, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • May 09, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 09, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 05, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 04, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • May 03, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 03, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 02, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 02, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 29, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 28, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order]
  • April 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • April 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 13, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • April 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 08, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 06, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 01, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 29, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 29, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 28, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 28, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 25, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Indictment]
  • March 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 18, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 08, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • March 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 07, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2016: [Receipt for Passport]
  • March 07, 2016: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • March 07, 2016: [Bond]
  • March 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 07, 2016: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • March 04, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order]
  • March 02, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 25, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • February 24, 2016: [Bond]
  • February 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • February 22, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 22, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 22, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • February 19, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • February 19, 2016: [Indictment]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 18, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 18, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 18, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 17, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 17, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 17, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 17, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • February 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 16, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 16, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • February 10, 2016: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 10, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 10, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
January, 2016
  • January 30, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • January 30, 2016: [Bond]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 21, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • January 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 07, 2016: [Letter]
  • January 06, 2016: [Bond]
  • January 04, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 04, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • January 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 03, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 31, 2015: [Sever Defendant]
  • December 30, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 28, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 24, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 23, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • December 23, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 09, 2015: [Bond]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 19, 2015: [Bond]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 18, 2015: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • November 16, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 13, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 12, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 11, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 06, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 05, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 03, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 30, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 30, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • October 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 14, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 14, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 14, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 14, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 14, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 14, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 09, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 01, 2015: [Arraignment]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • September 29, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 25, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2015: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.