U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Strickland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 23, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2016: [Dismiss ]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 26, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 22, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 07, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 07, 2015: [Seal]
  • December 07, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2015: [Suppress]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • November 12, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 23, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 14, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • October 14, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • October 14, 2015: [Bond]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 14, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 25, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 25, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • September 25, 2015: [Unseal Case]
  • September 25, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 25, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 25, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • September 25, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Case Unsealed]
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 25, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 25, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • September 25, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 25, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 25, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 25, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.