U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Douglas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 15, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 12, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 11, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 05, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 02, 2018: [Release from Custody ]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 18, 2018: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 05, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 02, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 02, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 28, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 28, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Remark]
  • February 01, 2017: [Exhibit]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • January 31, 2017: [Seal]
  • January 31, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 15, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 07, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • September 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2016
  • May 30, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 09, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 04, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 08, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 08, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 02, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 25, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.