U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hobby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 04, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 04, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • September 03, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • September 03, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Arrest ]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 30, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Transcript]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • June 28, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 15, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 31, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • May 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 24, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 23, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 05, 2015: [Search Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 05, 2015: [Application for Search Warrant]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 09, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 08, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 08, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 25, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.