U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neilsen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 27, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 27, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 27, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 25, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 25, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 25, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • January 25, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • April 26, 2016: [Exoneration of Bond]
  • April 20, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • March 29, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 29, 2016: [Seal]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 09, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 08, 2016: [Seal]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • February 10, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 09, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 09, 2016: [Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Court Exhibits]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • January 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 27, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 27, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 27, 2016: [Seal]
  • January 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 24, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 21, 2016: [Seal]
  • January 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 18, 2016: [Departure]
  • January 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 07, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2015
  • November 28, 2015: [Transcript]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 26, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 15, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 28, 2015: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.