U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Padilla
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 03, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Returning Submission]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 18, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Sealed Document]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Document]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 21, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • September 21, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [Restitution Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 18, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 17, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 17, 2018: [Seal]
  • September 06, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 05, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 01, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 01, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 07, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 13, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 17, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 28, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 21, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 29, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 01, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 01, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.