U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sayles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 20, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 04, 2021: [Violation Report]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 02, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.