U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benton et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • August 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 26, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 19, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 06, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 02, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • January 06, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 29, 2020: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Transcript]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 21, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 08, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 06, 2020: [2255 Motion Filed]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 17, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 15, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 06, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 11, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continue ]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Status Report]
  • February 13, 2020: [Continue ]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • December 13, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 04, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • December 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 03, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 03, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 12, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 07, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 24, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 21, 2019: [Violation Report]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 15, 2019: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • March 29, 2019: [Restitution Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2019: [2255 Motion Filed]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 03, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 03, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 03, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [Restitution Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [Seal]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 27, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 27, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • June 27, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • June 21, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 19, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 18, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 18, 2018: [Leave to File]
  • June 13, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • June 06, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 06, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 01, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 08, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 07, 2018: [Continue ]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Instrument Returned]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 12, 2018: [Continue ]
  • February 08, 2018: [Transcript]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Transcript]
  • December 21, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • December 14, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 11, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Continue ]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • December 03, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 03, 2017: [Leave to File]
November, 2017
  • November 26, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 24, 2017: [Transcript]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 16, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 16, 2017: [Seal]
  • November 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2017: [Seal]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 08, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 08, 2017: [Seal]
  • November 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2017: [USCA Request]
  • November 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • October 23, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 18, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • October 18, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 18, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Restitution Order Deadline]
  • October 16, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 16, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • October 16, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 16, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • October 13, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 10, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [ExParte Motion]
  • October 05, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 03, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • September 28, 2017: [ExParte Motion]
  • September 28, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 27, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 26, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 22, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 22, 2017: [Seal]
  • September 20, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 19, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 18, 2017: [Continue ]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Continue ]
  • July 20, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 26, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 26, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 05, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 13, 2017: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 23, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 23, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 21, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order Referring Plea]
  • March 15, 2017: [Suppress]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 15, 2017: [Witness List]
  • March 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 15, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 09, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 09, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 09, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 09, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 07, 2017: [Frye Hearing]
  • March 06, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 27, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 23, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 22, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Frye Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Suppress]
  • February 15, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • February 14, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 14, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 14, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 13, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 13, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 13, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 10, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 09, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 08, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Giglio Material]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
January, 2017
  • January 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 27, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 26, 2017: [Adopt]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 28, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • December 19, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • December 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • December 14, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • December 14, 2016: [Preclude]
  • December 14, 2016: [Compel ]
  • December 14, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • December 14, 2016: [Giglio Material]
  • December 14, 2016: [Discovery]
  • December 14, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • December 14, 2016: [Brady Materials]
  • December 13, 2016: [Preclude]
  • December 13, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • December 13, 2016: [Compel ]
  • December 13, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • December 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2016: [Giglio Material]
  • December 13, 2016: [Discovery]
  • December 13, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • December 13, 2016: [Brady Materials]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2016: [Reconsideration]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice]
  • November 30, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 22, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 22, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • November 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 12, 2016: [Transcript]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • October 17, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • October 05, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 26, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 02, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 30, 2016: [Incur Expenses (Sealed)]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • August 25, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 25, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • August 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 11, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • August 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 04, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 03, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2016: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • July 26, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Order Returning Submission]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 11, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 09, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 29, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 28, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 26, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 19, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 25, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 04, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 04, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • February 04, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 04, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 22, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 22, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 17, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 16, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 02, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 02, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 02, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 02, 2015: [Arrest ]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 23, 2015: [Vacate ]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 19, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 16, 2015: [CJA 30 - Appointment]
  • October 14, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 08, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 08, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.