U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00161-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Jernigan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 24, 2021: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 11, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 10, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 07, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2020: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Dismiss ]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • November 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 23, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 10, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 10, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Dismiss ]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Transcript]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 10, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • October 10, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 10, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 10, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 12, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 09, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 08, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 08, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 06, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 05, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 02, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 01, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2017
  • May 27, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 25, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 23, 2017: [Continue ]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 03, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • May 03, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Continue ]
  • April 26, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 30, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 27, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 26, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 20, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 13, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 13, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 11, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • January 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 11, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • January 11, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 11, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 08, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 28, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 23, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • November 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • November 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 15, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 09, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • November 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • October 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 06, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 23, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • September 23, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 23, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 31, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 31, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 31, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • July 27, 2016: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • July 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 19, 2016: [Transcript]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order Returning Submission]
  • July 13, 2016: [Bond]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 20, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 19, 2016: [Speedy Trial]
  • March 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 15, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 23, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 21, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 13, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 21, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 08, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 03, 2015: [Bond]
  • December 03, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 02, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 02, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 02, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 02, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 02, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 02, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 02, 2015: [Arrest ]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 30, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 25, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • November 25, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • November 25, 2015: [Bond]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 25, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 19, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 10, 2015: [Vacate ]
  • November 09, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 13, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 13, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 13, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 13, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 13, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 13, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 09, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • October 09, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 08, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 08, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 05, 2015: [Vacate ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.